OR HB2027 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person, public body or local service district from constructing bridge crossing Deschutes River within certain segment of Deschutes Scenic Waterway. Authorizes construction by person, public body, local service district or federal government of pedestrian and bicycle bridge crossing Deschutes River within certain segment of Deschutes Scenic Waterway.
Title
Relating to water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng.(Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 54; Absent, 1--Rayfield; Excused, 2--McKeown, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Lininger, McLane, Sollman. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-20 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |