OR HB2023 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 202, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 202, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Board of Education to ensure that academic content standards for certain subjects include sufficient instruction on histories, contributions and perspectives of certain classifications of individuals. Directs district school boards, State Board of Education and committees or officers responsible for adoption of textbooks and other instructional materials to ensure textbooks and other instructional materials adequately address roles in and contributions to economic, political and social development of Oregon and United States by certain classifications of individuals. Directs Department of Education to provide professional development to teachers and administrators related to academic content standards and textbook selection. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.].
Title
Relating to inclusive education.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 202, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 4--Johnson, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Winters. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hernandez. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 7--Bonham, Leif, Nearman, Reschke, Stark, Wallan, Wilson; Excused, 2--Barreto, Boshart Davis. |
2019-04-09 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |