OR HB2023 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends definition of "high-value farmland." Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to high-value farmland in a viticulture area; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-24 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2017-04-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |