OR HB2018 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 572, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 572, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers duties, functions and powers of Chief Education Office relating to statewide longitudinal data system to Higher Education Coordinating Commission. Establishes Task Force on Educational Accountability and Transparency. Prescribes membership and duties of task force.] Directs task force to submit report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education no later than December 1, 2020.] Sunsets December 31, 2020.] Authorizes commission to share data from system with persons or public bodies. Declares emergency, effective on passage] July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 572, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Roblan. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boles, Clem. |
2019-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-20 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-20 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-05-16 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-05-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Student Success. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |