OR HB2014 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for distribution of moneys in Oregon Marijuana Account to certain cities determined by population and location of city and based on share of retail sales of marijuana items in state, as exception to standard distributions based on city share of population and of licenses for marijuana-related businesses. Provides for distribution of moneys in Oregon Marijuana Account to certain cities determined by population and location of city and based on share of retail sales of marijuana items in state, as exception to standard distributions based on city share of population and of licenses for marijuana-related businesses. Applies to distributions from account occurring in calendar quarters beginning on or after January 1, 2022, and before July 1, 2027. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to distribution of revenues from taxes on marijuana items; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2014 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2014/Introduced |