OR HB2014 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Third reading. Carried by Prozanski, Fagan. Bill failed. Ayes, 14; Nays, 15--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Beyer, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Thomsen.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Restricts limitation on award of noneconomic damages to claims in actions for wrongful death. Corrects inaccurate reference for definition. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to damages; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski, Fagan. Bill failed. Ayes, 14; Nays, 15--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Beyer, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2019-06-04SenateMotion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 18--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Fagan, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Hass, Johnson, Manning Jr, Monnes Anderson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner.
2019-06-03SenateCarried over to 06-04 by unanimous consent.
2019-05-30SenateCarried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent.
2019-05-29SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-28SenateMinority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority)
2019-05-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-05-21SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-07SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-05-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-03-26SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-03-25HouseVote explanation(s) filed by McKeown, Stark, Wallan.
2019-03-25HouseThird reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 22--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Clem, Wilde.
2019-03-21HousePotential conflict(s) of interest declared by Rayfield.
2019-03-21HouseSecond reading.
2019-03-20HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-03-20HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2014
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2014/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2014/Senate%20Minority%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2014/Minority%20Report%20A-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28291
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=452006
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29595
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=471632
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=471740

Bill Comments

feedback