OR HB2009 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows individuals who do not qualify for medical assistance or premium tax credits under Affordable Care Act to enroll in coordinated care organizations by paying premiums that cover actuarial value of health services. Requires Oregon Health Authority to administer program. Imposes penalty on full-time residents of this state who are not enrolled in minimum essential coverage for nine months of each tax year. Prescribes procedures.
Title
Relating to health care; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2009 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2009/Introduced |