OR HB2009 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Advances sunset for subtraction for sale of manufactured dwelling park to certain entities. Creates personal income tax credit for sale of park. Provides that calculation of credit for taxes paid to other state allowed to nonresident taxpayer or allowed to estate treated as resident of another state occurs before allowance of credit for sale of park. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018, and before January 1, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax treatment of sale of manufactured dwelling parks; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2017-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2009 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2009/Introduced |