OR HB2009 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to ocean resources; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to ocean resources; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Boone [D] | Rep. Jean Cowan [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] |
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Joanne Verger [D] | Sen. Douglas Whitsett [R] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-05-18 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-03 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. | |
2011-04-22 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. | |
2011-04-22 | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-19 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-07 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-05 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Energy, Environment and Water. | |
2011-03-21 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/hb2000.dir/hb2009.intro.html |