OR HB2008 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 446, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 446, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides tax exemption for property of religious organization held or used solely to provide affordable housing to low income households. Provides tax exemption for property of religious organization held or used solely to provide affordable housing to low income households. Conditions tax exemption on property being subject to covenant to maintain affordability for not less than 60 years. Provides that default six-year sunset of tax expenditures does not apply to exemption. Requires initial claim to be filed with Department of Revenue and annual claims with county assessor thereafter. Restricts conditions that local governments may place on development of affordable housing provided by religious nonprofit corporations and expands zoning where such housing must be allowed. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to affordable housing provided by religious organizations; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Housing (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Housing (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 446, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-05-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Speaker Kotek. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Holvey, Noble, Power, Sanchez. |
2021-05-19 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Housing by order of Speaker. |
2021-02-24 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Housing. |
2021-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |