OR HB2008 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 198, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 198, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updates amount landlord must pay tenant of manufactured dwelling park upon closure of park to convert to other use. Requires Office of Manufactured Dwelling Park Community Relations to establish by rule process to annually recalculate amount landlord must pay tenant upon closure of park to convert to other use. Requires owner of manufactured dwelling park to give notice of conveyance of park to Office of Manufactured Dwelling Park Community Relations upon any sale, transfer, exchange or other conveyance. Requires new owner of manufactured dwelling that does not become member of park cooperative within six months after title transfer to remove manufactured dwelling from park. Provides exceptions. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to manufactured dwellings; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 198, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2017. |
2017-06-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, Olsen, Steiner Hayward. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 6--Barreto, Heard, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Wilson. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2017-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |