OR HB2006 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 18, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 12, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 18, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 12, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "emergency shelter." Requires local governments to allow siting of qualifying emergency shelters by qualifying entities notwithstanding land use laws and regulations. Defines "emergency shelter." Requires local governments to allow siting of qualifying emergency shelters by qualifying entities notwithstanding land use laws and regulations. Sunsets requirement July 1, 2022. Expands description of transitional housing accommodations to include motor-vehicle camping. Removes three-vehicle limit on motor-vehicle camping on religious institution property.] Expands motor-vehicle camping that political subdivisions may allow. Expands uses of Emergency Housing Account to include developing technical assistance regarding emergency shelters or transitional housing accommodations. Authorizes Housing and Community Services Department to use Emergency Housing Account to fund grants and technical assistance for organizations to develop or operate low-barrier emergency shelters, develop supportive facilities or provide rapid rehousing services and support. Authorizes Oregon Department of Administrative Services to distribute funds to develop navigation centers that must be operating on or before July 1, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to housing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 18, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 12, 2021. |
2021-05-12 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Linthicum; Absent, 1--Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Johnson. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Speaker Kotek. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Clem. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |