OR HB2003 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 202, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 202, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands membership of Public Defense Services Commission from seven to nine members. Expands membership of Public Defense Services Commission from seven to nine members. Modifies qualifications of members. Modifies duties of commission. Directs commission to adopt specified policies, including policies concerning compensation, caseloads and oversight. Directs commission to report on implementation of changes to committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary on or before February 1, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Public Defense Services Commission; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Jason Kropf [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] |
Rep. Boomer Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 202, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Thatcher. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Power, Noble. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Clem, Leif, Nearman. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |