OK SR83 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-12)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-12)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Resolution; proclaiming May 8, 2014, as Oklahoma Cooperative Extension Service Day in Oklahoma.
Title
Resolution; proclaiming May 8, 2014, as Oklahoma Cooperative Extension Service Day in Oklahoma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2014-05-07 | Senate | coauthored by all other Senators |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Considered |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Justice |
2014-05-05 | Senate | First Reading |