OK SR55 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-17)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-17)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Resolution recognizing May 3, 2012 as "Lupus Advocacy Day" at the State Capitol.
Title
Resolution recognizing May 3, 2012 as "Lupus Advocacy Day" at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State | |
2012-05-01 | Adopted, referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-01 | coauthored by all other Senators | |
2012-05-01 | Considered | |
2012-05-01 | Direct to Calendar | |
2012-04-30 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Constance) | |
2012-04-30 | First Reading |