OK SR31 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-9)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-9)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution; proclaiming March 24, 2022, as Oklahoma Agriculture Day; continuing efforts to recognize and support agriculture.
Title
Resolution; proclaiming March 24, 2022, as Oklahoma Agriculture Day; continuing efforts to recognize and support agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Coauthored by all other Senators |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Considered |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2022-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |