OK SR12 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-9)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-9)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution declaring February 18, 2020, as FFA Day in Oklahoma; applauding FFA's positive impact.
Title
A resolution declaring February 18, 2020, as FFA Day in Oklahoma; applauding FFA's positive impact.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by all other Senators |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Considered |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kidd |
2020-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |