OK SR11 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR11

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-6)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution proclaiming April 5, 2017 as the 21st Annual 4-H Day at the Oklahoma State Capitol and celebrating youth who have made an impact on the community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Resolution proclaiming April 5, 2017 as the 21st Annual 4-H Day at the Oklahoma State Capitol and celebrating youth who have made an impact on the community.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06SenateEnrolled, filed with Secretary of State
2017-04-05SenateAdopted, referred for enrollment
2017-04-05SenateCoauthored by all other Senators
2017-04-05SenateConsidered
2017-04-05SenateDirect to Calendar
2017-04-03SenateAuthored by Senator Boggs
2017-04-03SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SR11 (Carry Over) 2017-04-06 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback