OK SJR75 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Disapproving in part subject matter standards; sending back with instructions. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disapproving in part subject matter standards; sending back with instructions. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-22HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2016-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2016-03-21SenateEngrossed to House
2016-03-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-03-21SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
2016-03-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16
2016-03-21SenateEmergency clause restored
2016-03-21SenateTitle restored
2016-03-21SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2016-03-21SenateSenate Rule suspended
2016-03-21Senatecoauthored by Peterson (principal House author)
2016-03-21SenateEmergency clause stricken
2016-03-21SenateTitle stricken
2016-03-21SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2016-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2016-03-14Senatecoauthored by Sykes
2016-03-14SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2016-03-14SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7011103New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback