OK SJR65 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; providing for appointment of Labor Commissioner. Ballot title.
Title
Constitutional amendment; providing for appointment of Labor Commissioner. Ballot title.
Sponsors
Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Hall (principal House author) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |