OK SJR46 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR46
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; expanding certain rights of victims of criminal acts. Ballot title.
Title
Constitutional amendment; expanding certain rights of victims of criminal acts. Ballot title.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] | Rep. Tim Downing [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Griffin |
2017-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jordan, Nollan |
2017-04-04 | House | General Order |
2017-03-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Downing, McDugle, McBride, Cockroft |
2017-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Biggs (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SJR46 (Carry Over) 2017-04-05 - Filed with Secretary of State