OK SJR45 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR45

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; broadening uses of Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust. Ballot title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; broadening uses of Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust. Ballot title.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseWithdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-03-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-19SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-15SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 10
2018-03-15SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-03-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-03-15SenateRemove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Fields
2018-03-15Senateremove as principal author Representative Calvey and substitute with Representative Echols
2018-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Calvey (principal House author)
2018-02-28SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-28SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SJR45 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback