OK SJR43 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; recreating court system.
Title
Constitutional amendment; recreating court system.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] |
Sen. Joe Newhouse [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Daniels |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SCs named Treat, Daniels, Howard, Bullard, Leewright, Floyd, Boren |
2022-05-04 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Newhouse |
2022-05-02 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-05-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 24 |
2022-04-27 | House | Resolving clause stricken |
2022-04-27 | House | Amended |
2022-04-27 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-04-27 | House | General Order |
2022-04-26 | House | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 10 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |