OK SJR43 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR43

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; modifying certain appointment procedure for judicial vacancies. Ballot title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; modifying certain appointment procedure for judicial vacancies. Ballot title.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-03-22HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-22SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
2017-03-21SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-03-15SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2017-02-07Senatecoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-02-07SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Sykes
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SJR43 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
ART 7B4New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback