OK SJR41 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Joint resolution; Convention of States under Article V; proposing amendments to U.S. Constitution; directing transmission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint resolution; Convention of States under Article V; proposing amendments to U.S. Constitution; directing transmission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-04HouseWithdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-03-05HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-05SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-04SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-04SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11
2020-03-04SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2020-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
2020-02-10SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback