OK SJR35 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR35

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-8)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; creating Oklahoma Vision Fund. Ballot title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; creating Oklahoma Vision Fund. Ballot title.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2018-05-03HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled, to House
2018-05-03SenateReferred for enrollment
2018-05-03HouseTo Senate
2018-05-03HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
2018-05-03HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel
2018-05-03HouseCCR adopted
2018-05-02HouseCCR submitted
2018-05-02SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2018-05-02SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2018-05-01SenateCCR read, GCCA
2018-05-01SenateSCs named GCCA
2018-04-23HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2018-04-19SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2018-04-17SenateHAs read
2018-04-17HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-04-16HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-04-16HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3
2018-04-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lepak
2018-04-16HouseGeneral Order
2018-04-11HouseTitle restored
2018-04-11HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Standridge
2018-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-03-15HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-15SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Scott
2018-03-14SenateCoauthored by Senator Thompson, David, Floyd, Matthews, Leewright, Bice, Scott, Shaw, Rader, Fry, Dossett, Ikley-Freeman, Brooks, Pittman, Bass, Murdock, Silk, Smalley, McCortney, Pederson, Bergstrom, Daniels, Boggs, Holt, Fields, Simpson, Stanislawski, Griffin, Yen, Dugger, Jech, Rosino, Kidd, Sykes, Paxton, Pugh, Allen
2018-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2018-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-03-06SenateCoauthored by Senator Treat
2018-03-05SenateCoauthored by Senator Schulz
2018-02-28SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-28SenateReported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2018-02-05Senatecoauthored by Montgomery
2017-05-25Senatecoauthored by Martin
2017-05-25Senateremove as principal author Representative Martin and substitute with Representative McCall
2017-05-23SenateCoauthored by Representative Martin (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Sparks
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SJR35 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - coauthored by Martin

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sjr35&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SRES/SJR35%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SJR35%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SRES/SJR35%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SJR35%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SJR35%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SJR35%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SJR35%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SRES/SJR35%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SJR35_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SJR35_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback