OK SJR34 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; vote of the people; increasing limit of Constitutional Reserve Fund.
Title
Constitutional amendment; vote of the people; increasing limit of Constitutional Reserve Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] | Rep. Carl Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |