OK SJR34 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR34
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; requiring persons appearing to vote to provide proof of identity. Special election.
Title
Constitutional amendment; requiring persons appearing to vote to provide proof of identity. Special election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Special Election passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Downing (principal House author) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SJR34 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Rules