OK SJR33 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; providing that certain provision not be construed to prohibit certain military service.
Title
Constitutional amendment; providing that certain provision not be construed to prohibit certain military service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-03-07 | Senate | coauthored by Sykes |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Sykes; authored by Senator Fields |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2013-02-20 | Senate | coauthored by Enns (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |