OK SJR31 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Measure failed: Ayes: 4 Nays: 41
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Measure failed: Ayes: 4 Nays: 41
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; modifying provisions related to approval of exempt treatment; approval by board of county commissioners. Ballot title.
Title
Constitutional amendment; modifying provisions related to approval of exempt treatment; approval by board of county commissioners. Ballot title.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Newhouse [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] |
Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 4 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-05-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 4 Nays: 41 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Bullard |
2020-05-14 | Senate | HAs read |
2020-05-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2020-05-14 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2020-05-14 | House | Adoption of amendment rescinded |
2020-05-14 | House | Amended |
2020-05-14 | House | Third Reading rescinded |
2020-05-14 | House | Third Reading |
2020-05-14 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Treat |
2020-05-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Lepak |
2020-05-14 | House | General Order |
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newhouse |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |