OK SJR30 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; increasing maximum amount deposited into Constitutional Reserve Fund. Ballot title.
Title
Constitutional amendment; increasing maximum amount deposited into Constitutional Reserve Fund. Ballot title.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | coauthored by Lepak |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newhouse |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |