OK SJR27 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; modifying amount of deposit to the Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust. Ballot title.
Title
Constitutional amendment; modifying amount of deposit to the Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust. Ballot title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2020-05-14 | Senate | HAs read |
2020-05-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 17 |
2020-05-14 | House | Title restored |
2020-05-14 | House | Amended |
2020-05-14 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom |
2020-05-14 | House | General Order |
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |