OK SJR22 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Joint resolution disapproving certain rules of the Ethics Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint resolution disapproving certain rules of the Ethics Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 29
2019-05-22HouseGeneral Order
2019-05-20HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2019-05-17HouseRemove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Tadlock
2019-05-17HouseFirst Reading
2019-05-17SenateEngrossed to House
2019-05-17SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-05-17SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
2019-05-17SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-05-16SenateDirect to Calendar
2019-05-16SenateRemove as author Senator Treat; authored by Senator McCortney
2019-05-15SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
2019-05-15SenateAuthored by Senator Treat
2019-05-15SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback