OK SJR16 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR16

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; expanding rights of citizens to keep and bear arms. Ballot title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; expanding rights of citizens to keep and bear arms. Ballot title.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateCoauthored by Senator Stanislawski
2020-03-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2020-03-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Newhouse
2020-03-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Silk
2020-03-10Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Sean)
2020-03-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2020-03-05SenateCoauthored by Senator Hall
2020-03-04Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Dustin)
2020-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
2020-02-03SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2020-02-03SenateCoauthored by Senator Boggs
2020-02-03Senatecoauthored by Gann
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bullard
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SJR16 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Second Reading referred to Rules

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback