OK SJR16 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; modifying provision related to personal property tax exemption for certain veterans.
Title
Constitutional amendment; modifying provision related to personal property tax exemption for certain veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |