OK SJR16 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-20 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-20 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; providing ad valorem tax exemption for certain manufactured homes where certain disabled veterans reside; authorizing surviving spouse to claim certain exemption.
Title
Constitutional amendment; providing ad valorem tax exemption for certain manufactured homes where certain disabled veterans reside; authorizing surviving spouse to claim certain exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE RESOLVING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE RESOLVING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-19 | coauthored by Allen, Shortey, Brinkley | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-18 | Title restored | |
2011-05-18 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2011-05-12 | SCs named GCCA | |
2011-05-11 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules | |
2011-05-10 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-19 | HAs read | |
2011-04-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-18 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-18 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 | |
2011-04-18 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Moore, Roberts (Dustin) | |
2011-04-18 | General Order | |
2011-03-31 | Resolving clause stricken | |
2011-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-02-16 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2011-02-16 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee | |
2011-02-07 | coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author) | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Sparks | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |