OK SJR15 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Constitutional Amendment; prohibiting discrimination based on race or sex in public employment, education or contracts; ballot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional Amendment; prohibiting discrimination based on race or sex in public employment, education or contracts; ballot.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 56 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-03 Filed with Secretary of State
2011-05-03 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-03 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-02 Referred for enrollment
2011-04-27 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-04-27 Motion expired
2011-04-27 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Inman
2011-04-27 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 14
2011-04-27 Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Grau, Faught, Ritze, Derby, McCullough
2011-04-27 General Order
2011-04-07 Coauthored by Representative(s) Jackson, Trebilcock
2011-04-07 Remove Representative Jackson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Osborn
2011-04-07 CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2011-03-16 Second Reading referred to Rules
2011-03-09 First Reading
2011-03-09 Engrossed to House
2011-03-08 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-08 Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15
2011-03-08 coauthored by Shortey
2011-03-08 General Order, Considered
2011-02-28 coauthored by Jackson (principal House author)
2011-02-28 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2011-02-14 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob)
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7B4New CodeSee Bill Text
ART 236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
ART 7B4New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback