OK SJR12 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR12
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Coauthored by Representative Taylor (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Coauthored by Representative Taylor (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; increasing amount of votes necessary to retain certain officers. Ballot title.
Title
Constitutional amendment; increasing amount of votes necessary to retain certain officers. Ballot title.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Sen. Zack Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Taylor (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SJR12 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - Coauthored by Representative Taylor (principal House author)