OK SJR1 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR1
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; modifying activity prohibited for members and former members of the Legislature. Ballot title.
Title
Constitutional amendment; modifying activity prohibited for members and former members of the Legislature. Ballot title.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Chris Kannady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SJR1 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)