OK SCR7 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR7

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 115-32)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution recognizing National Retirement Planning Week 2017; and directing distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution recognizing National Retirement Planning Week 2017; and directing distribution.

Sponsors

Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R]Rep. Randy McDaniel [R]Rep. Kevin Calvey [R]Rep. Ed Cannaday [D]
Rep. John Enns [R]Rep. Scott Inman [D]Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D]Rep. George Faught [R]
Rep. Scott Martin [R]Rep. Todd Thomsen [R]Rep. Brian Renegar [D]Rep. Charles Ortega [R]
Rep. Pat Ownbey [R]Rep. Leslie Osborn [R]Rep. Cory Williams [D]Rep. Steve Kouplen [D]
Rep. Weldon Watson [R]Rep. Earl Sears [R]Rep. Eric Proctor [D]Rep. Jason Murphey [R]
Rep. Tommy Hardin [R]Rep. Emily Virgin [D]Rep. Steve Vaughan [R]Rep. Sean Roberts [R]
Rep. Dennis Casey [R]Rep. Josh Cockroft [R]Rep. Dustin Roberts [R]Rep. Donnie Condit [D]
Rep. John Bennett [R]Rep. Scott Biggs [R]Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R]Rep. Charles McCall [R]
Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R]Rep. Elise Hall [R]Rep. William Fourkiller [D]Rep. David Brumbaugh [R]
Rep. Glen Mulready [R]Rep. Jadine Nollan [R]Rep. John Pfeiffer [R]Rep. Scooter Park [R]
Sen. William Murdock [R]Rep. John Montgomery [R]Rep. Ben Loring [D]Rep. Mark Lepak [R]
Rep. Chris Kannady [R]Rep. John Jordan [R]Rep. Claudia Griffith [D]Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R]
Rep. Tim Downing [R]Rep. Mickey Dollens [D]Rep. Dale Derby [R]Rep. Carol Bush [R]
Rep. Meloyde Blancett [D]Rep. Forrest Bennett [D]Rep. Rhonda Baker [R]Rep. Greg Babinec [R]
Rep. Tess Teague [R]Rep. Mike Osburn [R]Rep. Monroe Nichols [D]Rep. Carl Newton [R]
Rep. Matt Meredith [D]Rep. Marcus McEntire [R]Rep. Scott McEachin [R]Rep. Kevin McDugle [R]
Rep. Ryan Martinez [R]Rep. Rande Worthen [R]Rep. Tammy West [R]Rep. Kevin West [R]
Rep. Josh West [R]Rep. Rick West [R]Rep. Collin Walke [D]Rep. Jason Lowe [D]
Rep. Mark Lawson [R]Rep. Dell Kerbs [R]Rep. Justin Humphrey [R]Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R]
Rep. Tom Gann [R]Rep. Avery Frix [R]Rep. Roger Ford [R]Rep. Cyndi Munson [D]
Rep. Regina Goodwin [D]Rep. George Young [D]Rep. Kevin Wallace [R]Rep. Johnny Tadlock [D]
Rep. Chuck Strohm [R]Rep. Shane Stone [D]Rep. Michael Rogers [R]Rep. Jason Dunnington [D]
Rep. Travis Dunlap [R]Rep. Ann Coody [R]Rep. Chad Caldwell [R]Rep. Jon Echols [R]
Rep. Katie Henke [R]Rep. David Perryman [D]Rep. Mark McBride [R]Rep. Todd Russ [R]
Rep. Lewis Moore [R]Rep. Mike Ritze [R]Rep. Mike Sanders [R]Rep. Harold Wright [R]
Sen. Randy Bass [D]Sen. Mark Allen [R]Sen. Eddie Fields [R]Sen. Julie Daniels [R]
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R]Sen. J.J. Dossett [D]Sen. Kevin Matthews [D]Sen. Ervin Yen [R]
Sen. Roger Thompson [R]Sen. Jason Smalley [R]Sen. Joseph Silk [R]Sen. Nathan Dahm [R]
Sen. Paul Scott [R]Sen. Dave Rader [R]Sen. Adam Pugh [R]Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R]
Sen. Roland Pederson [R]Sen. Lonnie Paxton [R]Sen. Joe Newhouse [R]Sen. Greg McCortney [R]
Sen. James Leewright [R]Sen. Chris Kidd [R]Sen. Tom Dugger [R]Sen. Ron Sharp [R]
Sen. Kyle Loveless [R]Sen. Ann Griffin [R]Sen. Greg Treat [R]Sen. Ralph Shortey [R]
Sen. David Holt [R]Sen. Kim David [R]Sen. Frank Simpson [R]Sen. Marty Quinn [R]
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D]Sen. Darcy Jech [R]Sen. Kay Floyd [D]Sen. Jack Fry [R]
Sen. Stephanie Bice [R]Sen. Rob Standridge [R]Sen. Larry Boggs [R]Sen. Wayne Shaw [R]
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R]Sen. Dan Newberry [R]Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R]Sen. Mike Schulz [R]
Sen. Bill Brown [R]Sen. John Sparks [D]Sen. Anthony Sykes [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2017-04-18HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-18SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-04-17SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-04-17HouseAdopted, returned to Senate
2017-04-17HouseCoauthored by all other Representatives
2017-04-05HouseIntroduced
2017-04-05SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-04SenateAdopted, referred for engrossment
2017-04-04SenateCoauthored by all other Senators
2017-04-04SenateDirect to Calendar
2017-03-28SenateCoauthored by Representative McDaniel (principal House author)
2017-03-28SenateAuthored by Senator Stanislawski
2017-03-28SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SCR7 (Carry Over) 2017-04-18 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback