OK SCR6 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR6

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-8)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution supporting the mission of the Oklahoma Veterans Pilot Program; encouraging Oklahomans to participate; and directing distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution supporting the mission of the Oklahoma Veterans Pilot Program; encouraging Oklahomans to participate; and directing distribution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2017-05-10HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-05-10SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-05-09SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-05-09HouseAdopted, returned to Senate
2017-05-09HouseConsidered
2017-04-25HouseIntroduced
2017-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-24SenateAdopted, referred for engrossment
2017-04-24SenateDirect to Calendar
2017-04-24SenateCoauthored by all other Senators
2017-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Simpson
2017-03-23SenateCoauthored by Representative Kannady
2017-03-23SenateCoauthored by Representative Young
2017-03-23SenateCoauthored by Representative Griffith (principal House author)
2017-03-23SenateAuthored by Senator Griffin
2017-03-23SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SCR6 (Carry Over) 2017-05-10 - Filed with Secretary of State

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback