OK SCR42 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution; urging rejection of certain national gas vehicle fuel standards.
Title
Concurrent Resolution; urging rejection of certain national gas vehicle fuel standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2014-05-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-08 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate |
2014-05-08 | House | Considered |
2014-05-06 | House | Introduced |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Considered |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2014-04-29 | Senate | coauthored by Cockroft (principal House author) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2014-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |