OK SCR42 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Authorizing Board of Regents to issue bonds for Rogers State University.
Title
Authorizing Board of Regents to issue bonds for Rogers State University.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Burrage [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. Tad Jones [R] | Rep. Lucky Lamons [D] |
Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-05-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-26 | Adopted, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Lamons, Hoskin | |
2010-05-26 | Considered | |
2010-05-20 | Introduced | |
2010-05-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-05-19 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2010-05-19 | Considered | |
2010-05-19 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Jones (principal House author) | |
2010-02-15 | Authored by Senator Burrage | |
2010-02-15 | First Reading |