OK SCR37 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-13)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution recognizing the importance of breast cancer awareness; designating April 26, 2016 as Breast Cancer Awareness Day in Oklahoma.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution recognizing the importance of breast cancer awareness; designating April 26, 2016 as Breast Cancer Awareness Day in Oklahoma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Introduced |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2016-04-26 | Senate | coauthored by all other Senators |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Considered |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2016-04-25 | Senate | coauthored by Goodwin |
2016-04-25 | Senate | coauthored by Shelton |
2016-04-25 | Senate | coauthored by Young (principal House author) |
2016-04-25 | Senate | coauthored by Matthews |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pittman |
2016-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |