OK SCR33 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution calling upon the Congress of the United States to initiate an amendment to the United States Constitution to require a balanced budget annually
Title
A Concurrent Resolution calling upon the Congress of the United States to initiate an amendment to the United States Constitution to require a balanced budget annually
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 38 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-04-02 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 38 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | HAs read | |
2012-04-03 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-02 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-02 | Amended | |
2012-04-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wright, Roberts (Sean), Bennett, McCullough, Denney, Billy, Grau, Derby, Hall, Roberts (Dustin) | |
2012-04-02 | Considered | |
2012-03-28 | Introduced | |
2012-03-28 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-27 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-27 | coauthored by Holt, Jolley, Brecheen, Schulz, Brinkley, Crain, David, Fields, Aldridge, Anderson, Barrington, Halligan, Simpson, Mazzei, Justice, Ford, Allen, Marlatt, Bingman, Sykes, Coates, Brown, Treat, Stanislawski | |
2012-03-27 | coauthored by Mulready (principal House author) | |
2012-03-27 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-03-27 | Direct to Calendar | |
2012-03-27 | Authored by Senator Newberry | |
2012-03-27 | First Reading |