OK SCR28 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Transfer of property; approving the transfer of property at Heavener Runestone State Park to the City of Heavener.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfer of property; approving the transfer of property at Heavener Runestone State Park to the City of Heavener.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-21 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
2012-05-21 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-21 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-18 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-18 Adopted, returned to Senate
2012-05-18 Coauthored by Representative(s) Osborn
2012-05-18 Considered
2012-05-17 Introduced
2012-05-17 Engrossed to House
2012-05-16 Adopted, referred for engrossment
2012-05-16 coauthored by Ritze (principal House author)
2012-05-16 Considered
2012-05-16 Direct to Calendar
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Allen
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback