OK SCR23 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-11)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution; recognizing the importance of breast cancer awareness; designating April 21, 2015, as Breast Cancer Awareness Day in Oklahoma.
Title
Concurrent Resolution; recognizing the importance of breast cancer awareness; designating April 21, 2015, as Breast Cancer Awareness Day in Oklahoma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | coauthored by all other Senators |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Considered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2015-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Shelton |
2015-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Young (principal House author) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Matthews |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pittman |
2015-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |