OK SB999 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB999
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation; creating the Oklahoma Courier Application Services Act. Effective date.
Title
Transportation; creating the Oklahoma Courier Application Services Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-03-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB999 (Carry Over) 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021