OK SB999 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB999
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; modifying certain notice requirements to victims and witnesses of crimes. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; modifying certain notice requirements to victims and witnesses of crimes. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar |
2019-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB999 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary