OK SB999 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Students; directing a student be considered a district member if the resident district changes for certain reasons. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Students; directing a student be considered a district member if the resident district changes for certain reasons. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2018-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |